IL HB2748 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on July 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Passed on July 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0173
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children with Disabilities Article of the School Code. Provides that if a student with an individualized education program (IEP) reaches the age of 22 during the time in which the student's in-person instruction, services, or activities are suspended for a period of 3 months or more during the school year as a result of the COVID-19 pandemic, the student is eligible for such services up to the end of the regular 2021-2022 school year, unless the student is no longer a resident of the school district that was responsible for the student's IEP at the time the student reached the student's 22nd birthday. Provides for (i) the resumption of the IEP goals in effect when the student reached the student's 22nd birthday; an exception for a private therapeutic day or residential program, and (iii) notification. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-SPECIAL ED-MAXIMUM AGE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0173 |
2021-07-28 | House | Effective Date July 28, 2021 |
2021-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2021-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2021-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 023-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2021-05-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Koehler |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 013-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2021 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 013-000-000 |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2021-04-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-22 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2021-04-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 023-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 020-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2021-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Ness |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 14-1.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |