IL HB2745 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Reinstates the research and development credit for tax years ending on or after January 1, 2017, and provides that the credit applies on a permanent basis. Provides that the credit may be carried forward for a period of 20 years (instead of 5 years). Creates an apprenticeship income tax credit. Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the manufacturing and assembling machinery and equipment exemption includes graphic arts machinery and equipment and production related tangible personal property. Provides that the exemption for coal and aggregate exploration, mining, off-highway hauling, processing, maintenance, and reclamation equipment applies on a permanent basis. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2017-03-09 | House | To Growth, Reform & Fairness Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 201 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 224 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2745&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2745.htm |