IL HB2739 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0720
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0720
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Private Primary Residential Flood Insurance Act. Sets forth provisions concerning flood insurance rates. Provides that an insurer shall file with the Department of Insurance all rates and any change to such rates within 30 days after the effective date of the rate change. Sets forth provisions concerning flood insurance forms. Provides that authorized insurers must notify the Department of plans to sell primary residential flood insurance products at least 30 days before writing flood insurance in the State and file a plan of operation and financial projections or material revisions to such plan. Sets forth provisions concerning notice to consumers that live in a special flood hazard area, notice of cancellation and nonrenewal, and surplus line placements of private flood insurance. Provides that rates, supplementary rate information, and any supporting information filed under the Act shall be open to public inspection upon disposition, except information marked and accepted by the Director of Insurance as confidential, trade secret, or proprietary by the insurer or filer. Provides that the Department may adopt rules to implement the Act.
Title
PRIVATE FLOOD INSURANCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0720 |
2022-05-06 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 011-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-02 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-002 |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-01-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2022-01-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-01-19 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 015-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2021-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 019-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |