IL HB2710 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Funeral or Burial Funds Act. Provides that, in the event a trust is used to fund a pre-need contract, the trustee of the trust shall issue a statement regarding the trust's performance to the beneficiary each month. Provides that the statement shall include the rate of interest, interest earned, net and liquid value, original principal investment, and any fees assessed by the banking or investment institution where the trust is held.
Title
FUNERAL PRE-NEED CONTRACTS
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-11 | House | To Business Licenses Subcommittee |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 45 | 4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2710&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB2710.htm |