IL HB2703 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-07-06 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Deletes language that exempts from copying and inspection: (i) any and all proprietary information and records related to the operation of an intergovernmental risk management association or self-insurance pool or jointly self-administered health and accident cooperative or pool; and (ii) insurance or self insurance (including any intergovernmental risk management association or self insurance pool) claims, loss or risk management information, records, data, advice or communications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOIA-EXEMPTIONS-INSURANCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-06HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-06-30HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017
2017-06-25HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-06-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-06-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-05-31HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017
2017-05-31HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-30HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-26HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 State Debt Impact Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Judicial Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Balanced Budget Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2017-05-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-012-000
2017-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-05-18HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-18HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-18HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-010-000
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-30HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-30HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 017-011-000
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51407Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback