IL HB2677 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Senior Citizens and Disabled Persons Property Tax Relief and Pharmaceutical Assistance Act. Provides for income eligibility limitations for a property tax relief grant beginning January 1, 2010 as follows: less than $23,507 for a household containing one person; less than $31,190 for a household containing 2 persons; or less than $38,871 for a household containing 3 or more persons. Provides that the Department on Aging may adopt rules providing for adjustments of those amounts based on exemptions from income.
Title
CIRCUIT BREAKER-INCOME GUIDES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-05 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2009-03-03 | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-24 | First Reading | |
2009-02-23 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2677&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB2677.htm |