IL HB2661 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0108
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Provides that an EMR, EMT, EMT-I, A-EMT, or Paramedic may transport a police dog injured in the line of duty to a veterinary clinic or similar facility if there are no persons requiring medical attention or transport at that time. Defines "police dog".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMS-TRANSPORTING POLICE DOGS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-15HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0108
2017-08-15HouseEffective Date January 1, 2018
2017-08-15HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-16HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 052-000-000
2017-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-12SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-28SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-28SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2017-03-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2017-03-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading March 28, 2017
2017-03-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-03-16HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2017-03-15HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-15HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2017-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Fire & Emergency Services Committee; 005-000-000
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee
2017-02-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2017-02-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210503.55Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback