IL HB2660 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on August 25 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0688
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Repeals the Domestic Violence Surveillance Fund. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that when a person is charged with a violation of an order of protection, the court may, in its discretion (rather than shall), order the respondent to undergo a risk assessment evaluation if certain conditions are present. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that under the Domestic Violence Surveillance Program, the best available technology must have real-time and interactive capabilities that facilitate the following objectives: (1) immediate notification to the supervising authority of a breach of a court ordered exclusion zone; (2) notification of the breach to the offender; and (3) communication between the supervising authority, law enforcement, and the victim, regarding the breach. Changes the protective order violation fines to fees. Provides that the supervising authority of a domestic violence surveillance program shall assess a person either convicted of, or charged with, the violation of an order of protection an additional fee to cover the costs of providing the equipment used and the additional supervision needed for such domestic violence surveillance program. Provides that if the court finds that the fee would impose an undue burden on the victim, the court may reduce or waive the fee. Provides that the court shall order that the defendant may not use funds belonging solely to the victim of the offense for payment of the fee. Amends the Probation and Probation Officers Act. Provides that the Division of Probation Services shall (rather than may) develop standards to implement the Domestic Violence Surveillance Program and shall develop standards for collecting data to evaluate the impact and costs of the Domestic Violence Surveillance Program. Effective immediately.
Title
DOMESTIC VIOLENCE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-25 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0688 | |
2009-08-25 | Effective Date August 25, 2009 | |
2009-08-25 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2009-05-30 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 117-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-20 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2009-05-18 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2009-05-18 | Arrived in House | |
2009-05-18 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | |
2009-05-18 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-05-18 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2009-05-18 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-05-15 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Garrett | |
2009-05-14 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 005-000-000 | |
2009-05-13 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law | |
2009-05-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-11 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-03-31 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Matt Murphy | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-26 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Susan Garrett | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William B. Black | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2009-03-24 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-001-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-03-24 | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-24 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-03-18 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-18 | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Bassi | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-06 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. | |
2009-03-06 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-03-06 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-03-06 | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo | |
2009-03-06 | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-05 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-03-03 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Coulson | |
2009-02-20 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2009-02-20 | Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Cross | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Suzanne Bassi |