IL HB2643 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-11-30 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-11-30 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Downstate Police Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that, if a special needs trust has been established for a disabled adult child, then the special needs trust may stand in lieu of the disabled adult child as a beneficiary for the purposes of the Article. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-ART 3-BENEFICIARY TRUST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2009-11-30 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-10-28 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Executive | |
2009-10-22 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2009 | |
2009-10-22 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive | |
2009-10-22 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-10-22 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-10-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading October 28, 2009 | |
2009-10-22 | Approved for Consideration Assignments | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled in Executive | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled in Executive | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-assigned to Executive | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Executive | |
2009-05-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Pensions and Investments | |
2009-05-27 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Pensions and Investments | |
2009-05-26 | Sponsor Removed Sen. Carole Pankau | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-26 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-05-22 | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Carole Pankau | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass Pensions and Investments; 008-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Pensions and Investments | |
2009-03-30 | Sponsor Removed Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-30 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-30 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-27 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-26 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-05 | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 010-000-000 | |
2009-02-25 | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee | |
2009-02-20 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-20 | First Reading | |
2009-02-20 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |