IL HB2641 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0481
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Protection of Individuals with Disabilities in the Criminal Justice System Task Force consisting of up to 25 members appointed by the Attorney General. Provides that the members shall reflect the racial, ethnic, and geographic diversity of the State. Specifies the categories of individuals to serve on the Task Force. Provides that the members of the Task Force shall serve without compensation. Provides that the Office of the Attorney General shall provide administrative and other support to the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force shall consider issues that affect adults and juveniles with disabilities with respect to their involvement with the police, detention and confinement in corrections facilities, representation by counsel, participation in the criminal justice system, communications with their families, awareness and accommodations for their disabilities, and concerns for the safety of the general public and individuals working in the criminal justice system. Provides that the Task Force shall make recommendations to the Governor and to the General Assembly regarding policies, procedures, legislation, and other actions that can be taken to protect the public safety and the well-being and rights of individuals with disabilities in the criminal justice system. Provides that the Task Force shall submit a report with its findings and recommendations to the Governor, the Attorney General, and the General Assembly on or before March 31, 2018. Repeals the Act on June 30, 2018. Effective immediately.
Title
DISABILITIES TASK FORCE
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Frances Hurley [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] | Sen. Scott Bennett [D] |
Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-24 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0481 |
2017-09-08 | House | Effective Date September 8, 2017 |
2017-09-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-07-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-06-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-06-24 | House | House Concurs |
2017-06-24 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2017-06-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 097-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Special Needs Services; 003-000-000 |
2017-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Special Needs Services |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis |
2017-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bennett |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Scott M. Bennett |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2017-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-04 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Special Needs Services; 004-000-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Special Needs Services; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Special Needs Services |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2017-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Special Needs Services |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |