IL HB2628 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Veterans Suicide Prevention Commission Act. Creates the Veterans Suicide Prevention Commission. Provides that the Commission's purpose is to prevent veteran suicide. Requires the Commission to: (i) drive the State's strategic vision for assessing and achieving the successful transition, adjustment, and reintegration of service members of the armed forces, veterans, and their families through the coordination of the collective efforts of public and private organization throughout the State with the goal of preventing veteran suicide; (ii) facilitate, collaborate, and coordinate the efforts of these organizations to effectively and responsively meet the needs of the military community with the goal of preventing veteran suicide; (iii) conduct planning, research, education, training, and evaluation activities to improve the operations and coordination of the systems of care and support with the goal of preventing veteran suicide; (iv) coordinate its activities with those of Illinois Joining Forces and other advocacy organizations for service members of the armed forces, veterans, and their families. Contains provisions concerning the Commission's composition; term appointments; meetings; and other matters. Provides that the duties of the Commission are to improve the efficiency and effectiveness of those State programs and services related to the military community; promote coordination and efficiency among State, county, and local units of government and municipalities; issue periodic reports on its performance and progress in meeting its goals; monitor the progress of the implementation of the Strategic Action Plan on Homelessness developed by specified federal agencies and other organizations as they address the needs of the service members and veterans community, and their families, to prevent veteran suicide; and other matters. Provides that the Commission is subject to the Freedom of Information Act and the Open Meetings Act.
Title
VETERANS SUICIDE PREVENTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Assigned to Veterans Affairs |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2021-04-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-04-20 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2021-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Veterans' Affairs Committee; 005-000-000 |
2021-04-06 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 006-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |