IL HB2628 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0263
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that service retirement pensions shall begin on the effective date of termination as reflected in the records of the Employer. Provides that upon certification of a member's termination (instead of cancellation of his teaching certificate) and on written application, a teacher shall be paid a refund. Provides that to obtain a refund for a member who has completed the minimum term of service required to establish eligibility for a pension, the member must execute and deliver to the Board a written acknowledgment of forfeiture of all service credit and rights to pension payments (instead of a written receipt and acknowledgment). Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-CHI TEACHERS-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0263 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date August 9, 2019 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Government Accountability and Ethics; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Government Accountability and Ethics |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 17-116 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 17-125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |