IL HB2613 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Short-Term, Limited Duration Health Insurance Coverage Act. Provides that any short-term, limited duration health insurance coverage policy that is delivered or issued for delivery in the State must have an expiration date in the policy that is less than 181 days after the effective date or December 31 of the current year, whichever is later (rather than must have an expiration date in the policy that is less than 181 days after the effective date).
Title
INS-SHORT TERM INS/EXPIRATION
Sponsors
Rep. Jed Davis [R] | Rep. Chris Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | To Insurance Main Subcommittee |
2024-01-31 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-28 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jed Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 190 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2613&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB2613.htm |