IL HB2613 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0245
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Obligation Bond Act and the Capital Development Bond Act of 1972. Provides that the unused portion of federal funds received for a capital improvement project for which moneys from the Capital Development Fund have been expended shall remain in the Capital Development Board Contributory Trust Fund and shall be used for capital projects and for no other purpose, subject to appropriation and as directed by the Capital Development Board.
Title
FIN-CDB-UNUSED FEDERAL FUNDS
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Sen. Iris Martinez [D] | Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] |
Sen. Dan Kotowski [D] | Sen. John Mulroe [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0245 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-001 |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 020-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-21 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-21 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 330 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 420 | 9a | Amended Code | Citation Text |