IL HB2594 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Trustees of Schools Article of the School Code. Allows the school board of South Holland School District 151 to withdraw from the jurisdiction and authority of the trustees of schools of Thornton Township and the township treasurer, provided that the school board elects or appoints its own school treasurer. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
SCH CD-TRUSTEES OF SCHOOLS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-001-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. William Davis |
2021-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-12 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 5-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |