IL HB2567 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the engrossed bill with changes. Amends the Design-Build Procurement Act. Extends repeal of the Act to January 1, 2024. Amends the Local Food, Farms, and Jobs Act. Provides that the State (rather than the Local Food, Farms, and Jobs Council) shall support and encourage that 10% of food and food products purchased by entities funded in part or in whole by State dollars be local farm or food products. Provides that all State agencies and State-owned facilities that purchase food and food products shall publish on their applicable procurement bulletin their farm or food purchases for the recently completed fiscal year. Provides that the first published report shall be due no later than January 1, 2022 and represent fiscal year 2021 purchases. Provides that a report shall be due each January 1 thereafter and be published on a form prescribed by each applicable Chief Procurement Officer. Removes provisions concerning the creation, responsibilities, and governance of the Local Food, Farms, and Jobs Council. Amends the Commission to End Hunger Act to make a conforming change concerning the Local Food, Farms, and Jobs Council. Amends the Illinois Human Rights Act. Provides that the Department of Human Rights shall establish a reasonable opportunity to cure any noncompliance with public contract requirements regarding equal employment opportunities and affirmative action by a bidder prior to the awarding of a contract. Makes conforming and other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PROCUREMENT-SINGLE PRIME PROJ
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - Motion in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-05-31 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2021-05-31 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Castro |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 015-000-000 |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Executive; 009-005-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 003-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | To Executive- Procurement |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 113-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 500 | 1-15.93 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 500 | 30-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |