IL HB2565 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Freedom to Work Act. Expands the scope of the Act to apply to all employees (rather than only low-wage employees). Prohibits all covenants not to compete. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FREEDOM TO WORK-ALL EMPLOYEES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 37 N: 62 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-04-11HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Lost 037-062-003
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-11HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-11HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-04-10HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-04-04HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-04-02HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-02HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-01HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-04-01HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 018-008-000
2019-03-27HouseReported Back To Labor & Commerce Committee;
2019-03-27HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Labor & Commerce Committee; 006-000-000
2019-03-06HouseTo Workforce Development Subcommittee
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2019-02-13HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-13HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8209010Amended CodeCitation Text
820905Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback