IL HB2557 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-29 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Bingo License and Tax Act. Removes language allowing the Department of Revenue to issue a special permit to an organization already possessing a bingo license to conduct bingo at other premises.
Title
GAMING-BINGO PREMISES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-29 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0177 |
2015-07-29 | House | Effective Date July 29, 2015 |
2015-07-29 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2015 |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 30, 2015 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 15, 2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 013-000-000 |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2015-03-19 | House | Remains in Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Revenue & Finance Committee; 006-000-000 |
2015-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2015-03-06 | House | To Finance Subcommittee |
2015-03-02 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 25 | 1.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |