IL HB2545 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that the county board or county board of commissioners may establish an urban agricultural area after receipt of an application by a qualified farmer or partner organization. Provides for the formation of an urban agricultural area committee that shall conduct the activities necessary to advise the county board or county board of commissioners on the designation, modification, and termination of an urban agricultural area. Provides that a county may provide for abatements of property taxes levied against real property located within an urban agricultural area that is used by a qualifying farmer for processing, growing, raising, or otherwise producing agricultural products. Provides that a county may authorize an entity providing water, electricity, or other utilities to an urban agricultural area to allow qualified farmers or partner organizations in the urban agricultural area to pay wholesale or otherwise reduced rates or pay reduced or waived connection charges. Limits restrictions, regulations, special assessments, and levies that a county may place on property in urban agricultural areas. Amends the Department of Agriculture Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Department shall adopt rules consistent with the purposes of the new provisions, including, at a minimum, rules defining specified terms. Provides that upon request from a county, the Department shall issue opinions regarding the consistency of applicants covered under these definitions. Amends the Property Tax Code and Illinois Municipal Code making conforming changes.
Title
COUNTY URBAN AGRICULTURAL ZONE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 205 | 205-65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 18-165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45005 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45010 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45015 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45020 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45025 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-45030 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | 5-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2545&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2545.htm |