IL HB2519 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-10 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-10 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Law Enforcement Gang Database Information Act. Provides that each law enforcement agency that maintains a gang database or has access to a shared gang database shall have a policy regarding those databases. Provides that the policy shall include, but not be limited to: (1) that personnel authorized to access a gang database or shared gang database are limited to sworn law enforcement personnel, non-sworn law enforcement support personnel, criminal justice entities, or non-criminal justice technical or maintenance personnel, including information technology and information security staff and contract employees, who have been subject to character or security clearance and who have received approved training; (2) any records contained in a gang database, shared gang database, gang-related information in a law enforcement agency case report, gang-related information in a law enforcement agency dispatch note, or gang-related information in a law enforcement agency dispatch system record shall not be disclosed for the following purposes: employment, education, licensing, or housing, except that law enforcement and criminal justice entities may use information contained in a gang database or shared gang database for employment purposes, and records contained in a gang database or shared gang database may be disclosed to comply with federal law, for national security or homeland security purposes, for military screening purposes, or for other appropriate law enforcement purpose; (3) security procedures; and (4) the review and purge process from gang databases and shared gang databases. Defines terms. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that in all criminal cases, evidence which indicates the mere presence that the person was or is on a gang database or a shared gang database is not admissible. Effective immediately.
Title
STATEWIDE GANG DATABASE-REPEAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 34 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2021 |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-01-10 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As January 13, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 10, 2021 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Criminal Law |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-034-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2640 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |