IL HB2515 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Provides that at least 9 (rather than 6) members appointed to the Prisoner Review Board must have had at least 5 (rather than 3) years' experience in the field of juvenile matters including a post-graduate degree and a demonstrated competency in the field of adolescent development. Provides that no more than 3 members qualified in the field of juvenile matters may use their experience in law enforcement, the prosecution of juveniles, corrections, or their prior experience as a member of the Board prior to the effective date of the amendatory Act, towards their 5 years of actual experience in the field of juvenile matters. Provides that a person under 21 years of age at the time of the commission of a non-homicide offense or offenses, and who is not serving a sentence for a homicide offense, shall be eligible for parole review by the Prisoner Review Board after serving 10 years or more of his or her sentence. Provides that a person under 21 years of age at the time of the commission of a homicide offense or offenses shall be eligible for parole review by the Prisoner Review Board after serving 20 years or more of his or her sentence. Provides that 3 years prior to becoming eligible for parole review, the eligible person may file his or her petition for parole review with the Prisoner Review Board. Provides that the eligible person has a right to be physically present at the Prisoner Review Board hearing. Provides that the eligible person and his or her counsel have a right to present written documents and oral testimony at the Prisoner Review Board hearing. Provides that, unless denied parole, the eligible person shall be released on parole which shall operate to discharge the remaining term of years or natural life sentence imposed upon him or her, notwithstanding any required mandatory supervised release period the eligible person is required to serve.
Title
PAROLE-OFFENSE UNDER 21
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-07-06 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-06-30 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) July 7, 2017 |
2017-05-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee |
2017-05-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee |
2017-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 6 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 5 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-05-18 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-18 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice Committee; 007-004-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee |
2017-04-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-03-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 008-002-000 |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Restorative Justice Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 5 | 3-3-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 3-3-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-4.5-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
735 | 5 | 3-104 | Amended Code | Citation Text |