IL HB2510 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Food Handling Regulation Enforcement Act. Provides that all food service establishments shall have at least one certified food service sanitation manager who has undergone training that follows nationally recognized industry standards for allergen safety and allergen awareness available on the premises at all times that the food service establishment is in operation. Provides that all individuals seeking food service sanitation manager certification or food service sanitation manager recertification shall undergo training that follows nationally recognized industry standards for allergen safety and allergen awareness. Provides that any costs for the allergen safety and allergen awareness training shall be borne by the individual seeking the training. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FOOD HANDLING-ALLERGEN SAFETY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 77 N: 32 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-18SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2017-05-17SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-05-17SenateFirst Reading
2017-05-17SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2017-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-05-17SenateArrive in Senate
2017-05-17HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 077-032-000
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2017-05-17HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2017-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2017-05-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2017-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-15HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-05-15HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-15HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-05-15HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000
2017-05-02HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Consumer Protection Committee; 003-002-000
2017-04-26HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Consumer Protection Committee; 005-000-000
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Consumer Protection Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-22HouseAssigned to Consumer Protection Committee
2017-02-08HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-08HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4106253Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback