IL HB2484 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Property Tax Code. Provides that for providing to the Department of Revenue the Director of Natural Resources and shall be assessed by the Department of Revenue (rather than by proof of a valid facility number issued by the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency). Deletes language regarding the approval procedure for a qualifying water treatment facility, except for language regarding the effective date of certificates. Makes a technical correction concerning a reference to the Department of Natural Resources.
Title
PROP TAX-WATER TREAT FACILITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
2019-03-06 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Severin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 11-155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 11-160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 11-165 | Amended Code | Citation Text |