IL HB2472 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Abolishes municipal officers electoral boards, township officers electoral boards, and education officers electoral boards and transfers their duties to the county officers electoral board of counties with a population of less than 3,000,000. Provides that if a municipality, township, or community college district is located in 2 or more counties, including a county with a population of 3,000,000 or more, the county officers electoral board of the county in which the principal office of the municipality, township, or community college district is located shall hear and pass upon objections to nominations of candidates. Makes conforming changes. Amends the Illinois Municipal Code to make a conforming change.
Title
ELEC CD-ELECTORAL BOARDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | To Election Administration Subcommittee |
2017-02-22 | House | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Finance Committee |
2017-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 10-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 10-9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 7-7-11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2472&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2472.htm |