IL HB2470 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-05 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Identification Act concerning the expungement and sealing of criminal records. Provides that the petitioner, State's Attorney or prosecutor charged with the duty of prosecuting the offense, the arresting agency, or the chief legal officer of the unit of local government effecting the arrest (rather than the petitioner or any party entitled to notice) may file a motion to vacate, modify, or reconsider the order granting or denying the petition to expunge or seal within 60 days of service of the order.
Title
CRIM ID-EXPUNGEMENT&SEALING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-05 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0163 |
2013-08-05 | House | Effective Date August 5, 2013 |
2013-08-05 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-018-001 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2013 |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-002-002 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 075-032-000 |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2013-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kenneth Dunkin |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-04-17 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-04-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-04-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-04-17 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-04-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Restorative Justice Committee; 007-000-000 |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles E. Jefferson |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deborah Mell |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon-Booth |
2013-04-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2013-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Restorative Justice Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann Williams |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2013-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Restorative Justice Committee; 006-000-000 |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2013-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Restorative Justice Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Arthur Turner |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2630 | 5.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |