IL HB2452 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0243
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medical Patient Rights Act. Provides that a health care facility that provides treatment or care to a patient in this State (rather than a health care facility licensed in this State) shall require each employee of or volunteer for the facility, including a student, who examines or treats a patient or resident of the facility to wear an identification badge that readily discloses the first name, licensure status, if any, and staff position of the person examining or treating the patient or resident.
Title
PATIENT RIGHTS-ID BADGES
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Walsh [D] | Rep. John Cabello [R] | Rep. Darlene Senger [R] | Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 89 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0243 |
2013-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-001-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2013 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 18, 2013 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 006-000-000 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-03-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 089-020-000 |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-13 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2013-03-04 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence M. Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 50 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |