IL HB2408 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0385
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Removal of Private Compromising Images Act. Defines terms. Provides that a person shall not post a private compromising image of another person online. Provides that a person may file a petition for a take-down order if the person discovers that a private compromising image of himself or herself is posted online. Provides that if the court finds that the defendant posted a private compromising image, then the court shall enter a take-down order and the defendant shall immediately delete or remove the private compromising image from the website. Provides that upon the return of service date, if the plaintiff presents prima facie evidence that the image at issue is a private compromising image of the plaintiff, then the court shall enter an emergency take-down order without a hearing to have the image removed from the website immediately. Provides that a person who is found to have posted a private compromising image of another person by a court shall be liable for damages. Provides that the amount of damages shall be at the discretion of the court.
Title
REMOVAL OF COMPROMISING IMAGES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0385 |
2019-08-16 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2019 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 29, 2019 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 006-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2019 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2019-03-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2019-03-26 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-26 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee; |
2019-03-26 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 006-000-000 |
2019-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-03-05 | House | To Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Avery Bourne |