IL HB2401 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0060
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0060
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Probation and Probation Officers Act. Provides that in a county with a population exceeding 2,000,000, the Redeploy Illinois Oversight Board may authorize the Department of Human Services to enter into an agreement with that county to reduce the number of commitments by the same percentage as is required by this Section of other counties, and with all of the same requirements of the Act, including reporting and evaluation, except that the agreement may encompass a clearly identifiable geographical subdivision of that county. Provides that the geographical subdivision may include, but is not limited to, a police district or group of police districts, a geographical area making up a court calendar or group of court calendars, a municipal district or group of municipal districts, or a municipality or group of municipalities.
Title
PROBATION-REDEPLOY IL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Motion in House (Y: 64 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - Motion in House (Y: 64 N: 46 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0060 |
2013-07-08 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2014 |
2013-07-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-06-12 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 039-009-000 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2013 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 009-000-000 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. William Delgado |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 064-046-000 |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2013-04-10 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-20 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary; 016-000-000 |
2013-03-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2013-03-11 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
730 | 110 | 16.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |