IL HB2392 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-12)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning teacher certification.
Title
EDUCATION-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2011-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2011-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2011-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Harry Osterman |
2011-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William D. Burns |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2011-04-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2011-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marlow H. Colvin |
2011-04-04 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2011-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2011-04-01 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy Ramey, Jr. |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelo Saviano |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Nybo |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bill Mitchell |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chapin Rose |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Derrick Smith |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly Burke |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Cunningham |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin A. McCarthy |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. |
2011-04-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joseph M. Lyons |
2011-04-01 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2011-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-03-07 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2011-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Cross |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 21-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |