IL HB2383 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0050
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0050
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Provides that the provision requiring the Department of Human Services to develop a training program for authorized direct care staff to administer medications under the supervision and monitoring of a registered professional nurse applies to (i) all residential programs (rather than all programs) for persons with a developmental disability in settings of 16 persons or fewer that are funded or licensed by the Department of Human Services and that distribute or administer medications, and (ii) all day programs certified to serve persons with developmental disabilities by the Department of Human Services. Provides that the training program for authorized direct care staff shall include educational and oversight components for staff who work in day programs that are similar to those for staff who work in residential programs. Effective January 1, 2018.
Title
MHDDAA-STAFF ADM MEDS
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Frese [R] | Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R] |
Rep. Dave Severin [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] | Rep. Timothy Butler [R] | Sen. Dave Syverson [R] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0050 |
2017-08-11 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017 |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 008-000-000 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-000 |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2017-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2017-03-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 010-001-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2017-02-23 | House | Remains in Human Services Committee |
2017-02-23 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Human Services Committee; 005-005-001 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 15.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |