IL HB2383 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 19 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Administrative Act. Provides that the provision requiring the Department of Human Services to develop a training program for authorized direct care staff to administer medications under the supervision and monitoring of a registered professional nurse applies to (i) all residential (rather than all programs) for persons with a developmental disability in settings of 16 persons or fewer that are funded or licensed by the Department of Human Services and that distribute or administer medications, and (ii) all day programs certified to serve persons with developmental disabilities by the Department of Human Services. Provides that the training program for authorized direct care staff shall include educational and oversight components for staff who work in day programs that are similar to those for staff who work in residential programs. Effective January 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MHDDAA-STAFF ADM MEDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-000-000
2017-05-19SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2017
2017-05-03SenateDo Pass Human Services; 008-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Human Services
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-05SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson
2017-04-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 6, 2017
2017-04-05SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-001-000
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-03-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2017-03-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-03-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-23HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-22HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 010-001-000
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2017-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese
2017-02-23HouseRemains in Human Services Committee
2017-02-23HouseMotion Do Pass - Lost Human Services Committee; 005-005-001
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Randy E. Frese

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20170515.4Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback