IL HB2373 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-18 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $10,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Children and Family Services for the purpose of making grants to the Children’s Advocacy Centers of Illinois for operational costs. Effective July 1, 2021.
Title
$DCFS-CHILD ADVOCACY CENTER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-18 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2021-03-19 | House | To Special Issues (AP) Subcommittee |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2373&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/PDF/10200HB2373.pdf |