IL HB2372 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that, on or after July 1, 2017 and on or before December 31, 2018, the taxes imposed under the Acts apply to 90% of the proceeds of sales of gasohol and 80% of the proceeds of sales of mid-range ethanol blends. Amends the Illinois Renewable Fuels Development Program Act. Provides that grants may be awarded for the following programs: a next generation renewable fuels program, a majority blended ethanol and blender pump infrastructure program, and a research and development program for sustainable corn production and corn-based renewable fuel production. Sets forth the maximum aggregate amount of grants that may be awarded under each program. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC TX-GASOHOL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2017-03-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-24 | House | To Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 689 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 689 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-44 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-44.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 110 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 3-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2372&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB2372.htm |