IL HB2361 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the City of Chicago may enact an ordinance providing for a noise monitoring system upon any portion of the roadway known as Lake Shore Drive. Defines "noise monitoring system". Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-STREET NOISE MONITORING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Motion in House (Y: 85 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Motion in House (Y: 85 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0257 |
2017-08-22 | House | Effective Date August 22, 2017 |
2017-08-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2017-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017 |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017 |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 015-000-000 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-04-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-05 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-030-000 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2017-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2017-03-09 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2017-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-02-23 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000 |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-03 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208 | Amended Code | Citation Text |