IL HB2361 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the City of Chicago may enact an ordinance providing for a noise monitoring system upon any portion of the roadway known as Lake Shore Drive. Defines "noise monitoring system". Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-STREET NOISE MONITORING

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - Motion in House (Y: 85 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-22HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0257
2017-08-22HouseEffective Date August 22, 2017
2017-08-22HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-28HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2017-05-26SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2017
2017-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 24, 2017
2017-05-23SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2017
2017-05-09SenateDo Pass Transportation; 015-000-000
2017-05-03SenatePostponed - Transportation
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-030-000
2017-04-05HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading - Consideration Postponed
2017-03-07HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-07HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-02-23HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-02-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-02-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-16HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-03HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-03HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-03HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-208Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback