IL HB2353 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0275
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0275
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961 relating to the offense of money laundering. Changes the definition of "criminally derived property" to: (1) any property, real or personal, constituting or derived from proceeds obtained, directly or indirectly, from activity that constitutes a felony under State, federal, or foreign law; or (2) any property represented to be property constituting or derived from proceeds obtained, directly or indirectly, from activity that constitutes a felony under State, federal, or foreign law (rather than a violation of the Criminal Code of 1961, the Illinois Controlled Substances Act, the Cannabis Control Act, or the Methamphetamine Control and Community Protection Act). Establishes penalties for laundering of property by transporting, transmitting, or transferring, or attempting to transport, transmit, or transfer a monetary instrument knowing, or having reason to know, that the financial transaction is designed in whole or in part to avoid a transaction reporting requirement under State law. Effective immediately.
Title
CRIM CD-MONEY LAUNDERING
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Joyce [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0275 | |
2009-08-11 | Effective Date August 11, 2009 | |
2009-08-11 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-14 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-05-14 | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Second Reading | |
2009-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2009 | |
2009-04-30 | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 | |
2009-04-22 | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan Kotowski | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Criminal Law | |
2009-04-21 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Edward D. Maloney | |
2009-04-15 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-15 | First Reading | |
2009-04-14 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-04-14 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2009 | |
2009-04-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-04-01 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-000 | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-30 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-19 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kevin Joyce |