IL HB2344 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-28 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to Illinois State University for its FY16 ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2015.
Title
$ISU-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-21 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Sandack |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2016-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-04-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2016-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2016-04-18 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Mike Fortner |
2016-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Fortner |
2016-01-29 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 28, 2016 |
2016-01-03 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) January 29, 2016 |
2015-05-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2015-04-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-02-17 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |