IL HB2328 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-01-11 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $100,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Environmental Protection Agency to support the alternate fuels rebate program. Provides that such funding shall support grants and rebates only for vehicles that operate on propane or natural gas. Effective immediately.
Title
$ALTERNATE FUELS REBATE
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-11 | Session Sine Die | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-04-22 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. J. Bradley Burzynski | |
2009-04-22 | Assigned to Appropriations II | |
2009-03-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-30 | First Reading | |
2009-03-27 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon | |
2009-03-27 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 26, 2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Arrive in Senate | |
2009-03-24 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 | |
2009-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-05 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-03-04 | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 006-000-000 | |
2009-02-23 | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-02-18 | First Reading | |
2009-02-18 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Winters |