IL HB2323 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0798
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0798
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes. Moves the provisions to the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Act from the Illinois State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority (rather than the Illinois State Police) shall establish a Uniform Statewide Crime Statistics Task Force within 120 days (rather than 90 days) after the effective date of the amendatory Act and provide administrative and technical (rather than other) support to the Task Force. Provides that the members of the Task Force shall be appointed by the Executive Director of the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority (rather than the Director of the Illinois State Police), and modifies the membership of the Task Force. Requires the Task Force to meet at least quarterly (rather than monthly). Requires the Task Force to submit a report no later than 18 months after first convening (rather than one year after the effective date of the amendatory Act) to the Governor, General Assembly, and the Director of the Illinois State Police (rather than only to the Director). Modifies the requirements of the report. Further amends the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Act. Provides that the Authority may exercise any other powers that are reasonable and necessary to fulfill the responsibilities of the Authority under this Act and to comply with the requirements of applicable State or federal law (rather than federal law) or regulation.
Title
UNIFORM CRIME STATISTICS DATA
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Didech [D] | Rep. John Cabello [R] | Sen. Mary Edly-Allen [D] | Sen. Adriane Johnson [D] |
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-24 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0798 |
2024-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2025 |
2024-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2024-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2024-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Meg Loughran Cappel |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2024-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2024-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2024-05-24 | House | House Concurs |
2024-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs |
2024-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2024-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-05-16 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-05-16 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2024-05-15 | House | Arrived in House |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2024 |
2024-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2024 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety; 008-000-000 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 10, 2024 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Special Committee on Criminal Law and Public Safety |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Mary Edly-Allen |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2024-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2024-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-02 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 015-000-000 |
2024-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2024-03-20 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-13 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel Didech |