IL HB2308 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on July 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0138
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that in the event the defendant is unable to post bond, the court may impose a no contact provision with the victim or other interested party that shall be enforced while the defendant remains in custody.
Title
CRIM PRO-NO CONTACT-VICTIM
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] | Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] | Sen. Dale Righter [R] | Sen. Jason Plummer [R] |
Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Sen. William Cunningham [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0138 |
2019-07-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dale A. Righter |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-002 |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-05 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 110-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |