IL HB2304 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0469
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Provides that subject to appropriation, the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity may establish a Training in the Building Trades Program (Program) to award grants to community-based organizations for the purpose of establishing training programs for persons who are 18 through 35 years of age and have an interest in the building trades. Provides that persons eligible to participate in the Program shall include youth who have aged out of foster care and have an interest in the building trades. Provides that under the training programs, participating persons shall receive: (i) formal training and education in the fundamentals and core competencies in the person's chosen trade; and (ii) hands-on experience to further develop the person's building trade skills by participating in community improvement projects involving the rehabilitation of vacant and abandoned residential property in economically depressed areas of the State. Requires selected organizations to also use the grant money to establish an entrepreneurship program to provide eligible persons with the capital and business management skills necessary to successfully launch their own businesses as contractors, subcontractors, real estate agents, or property managers or as any other entrepreneurs in the building trades. Contains provisions concerning residential property that is eligible for acquisition and rehabilitation under the Program; the selection criteria for community-based organizations; and the Training in the Building Trades Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Training in the Building Trades Fund. Effective January 1, 2020.
Title
DHS-BUILDING TRADES PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-01 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-23 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0469 |
2019-08-23 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-23 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-06-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2019-06-01 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-06-01 | House | House Concurs |
2019-06-01 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2019-06-01 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2019-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 046-012-000 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Martinez |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 006-003-000 |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-03-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 10-48 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 3805 | 7.32 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.891 | New Code | See Bill Text |
30 | 105 | 5.892 | New Code | See Bill Text |