IL HB2300 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Use Tax Act, the Service Use Tax Act, the Service Occupation Tax Act, and the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. Provides that the manufacturing and assembling machinery and equipment exemption includes production related tangible personal property. Provides that a Manufacturer's Purchase Credit may not be taken on or after July 1, 2019. Effective immediately.
Title
REVENUE-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Rep. Bob Morgan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bob Morgan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 105 | 3-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 105 | 3-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 110 | 3-70 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 115 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 2-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 120 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2300&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2300.htm |