IL HB2272 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Board of Legislative Repealers Act. Establishes the Board of Legislative Repealers. Directs the Board, among other things, to determine instances in which State laws and regulations are unreasonable, unduly burdensome, duplicative, onerous, in conflict, or unconstitutional, to create a system for receiving public comments, and to recommend changes in the law that it deems necessary to modify or eliminate antiquated and inequitable rules of law and to bring the law of the State into harmony with modern conditions. Authorizes the Board to set a schedule to make the investigations required by the Act and to adopt rules establishing the criteria to be used to determine whether a State law, regulation, or other governing instrument is unreasonable, unduly burdensome, duplicative, or onerous, or conflicts with another law, regulation, or governing instrument. Amends the Legislative Commission Reorganization Act of 1984 and the Legislative Reference Bureau Act. Requires the staff of the Legislative Reference Bureau and the Legislative Research Unit to cooperate to provide administrative support to the Board. Authorizes the Board to adopt any rules that are necessary to implement the requirements of the Act. Effective July 1, 2014.
Title
BOARD OF REPEALERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2013-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ron Sandack |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 130 | 2-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 130 | 4-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
25 | 135 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2272&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB2272.htm |