IL HB2238 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0641
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0641
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
If and only if Senate Bill 1863 of the 101st General Assembly becomes law in the form in which it passed the House of Representatives on May 21, 2020, then amends the Election Code. In provisions concerning changes for vote by mail official ballot mailing and processing for the 2020 general election, makes changes to the panels created by election authorities to compare the voter's signature on the certification envelope of the vote by mail ballot with the signature of the voter on file in the office of the election authority. Requires a vote of 3 of 3 election judges for a vote by mail ballot to be rejected because the signature on the certification envelope and the signature used by the election authority for verification purposes do not match or the certification envelope contains a signature but not in the proper location. Requires a majority vote (rather than a vote of 3 of 3 judges) for other specified reasons. If election judges (rather than 3 of 3 election judges) determine the ballot should be rejected for any reasons stated in the provisions, requires the judges to mark across the face of the certification envelope the word "rejected" and the date and names of the judges voting to reject the ballot. Requires all collection sites for vote by mail ballots to be secured by locks that may be open only by election authority personnel and requires the State Board of Elections to establish additional guidelines for the security of collection sites. Effective upon becoming law or on the date Senate Bill 1863 of the 101st General Assembly takes effect, whichever is later.
Title
TREASURER-DEPOSIT OF ST MONEY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-22 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 72 N: 43 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0641 |
2020-06-16 | House | Effective Date June 16, 2020 |
2020-06-16 | House | Governor Approved |
2020-06-08 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Eva Dina Delgado |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2020-05-22 | House | House Concurs |
2020-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 072-043-000 |
2020-05-22 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2020-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2020-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-05-22 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3 |
2020-05-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-019-000 |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Withdrawn by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-05-22 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Legislation Considered in Special Session No. 1 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2020 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2020 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-12-15 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 12, 2019 |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2019-11-06 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As November 14, 2019 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2019 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass Financial Institutions; 008-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Financial Institutions |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000 |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 520 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 520 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 520 | 22.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |