IL HB2233 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-02 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0184
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Civil Procedure. Provides that within the discretion of the court, the jury may be asked (rather than required by the court, and must be required on the request of any party) to find specially upon any material question or questions of fact submitted to the jury in writing. Provides that any party may request special interrogatories. Provides that submitting or refusing to submit a question of fact to the jury may be reviewed on appeal to determine whether the trial court abused its discretion (rather than as a ruling on a question of law). Provides that when any special finding of fact is inconsistent with the general verdict, the court shall direct the jury to further consider its answers and verdicts, and if, in the discretion of the trial court, the jury is unable to render a general verdict consistent with any special finding, the trial court shall order a new trial (rather than the former controls the latter and the court may enter judgment accordingly). Provides that during closing arguments, the parties shall be allowed to explain to the jury what may result if the general verdict is inconsistent with any special findings. Provides that the Act applies only to trials commencing on or after January 1, 2020. Effective immediately.
Title
SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES-REPEAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-08 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 74 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0184 |
2019-08-02 | House | Effective Date August 2, 2019 |
2019-08-02 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-08 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 037-017-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2019 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 007-003-000 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 074-037-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | Removed from Short Debate Status |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-11 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2019-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-004-000 |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-02 | House | Home Rule Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-04-02 | House | Correctional Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-04-02 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested - Withdrawn by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-04-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 008-005-000 |
2019-03-26 | House | Balanced Budget Note Filed |
2019-03-25 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Filed |
2019-03-21 | House | State Debt Impact Note Filed |
2019-03-21 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2019-03-21 | House | Judicial Note Filed |
2019-03-21 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2019-03-21 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Filed |
2019-03-20 | House | State Debt Impact Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-20 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-20 | House | Land Conveyance Appraisal Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-20 | House | Judicial Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-20 | House | Housing Affordability Impact Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-20 | House | Home Rule Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-20 | House | Correctional Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-20 | House | Balanced Budget Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-20 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-20 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. André Thapedi |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-03-20 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 002-001-000 |
2019-02-20 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. André Thapedi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
735 | 5 | 2-1108 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |