IL HB2203 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Jury Act. Provides that a circuit court shall develop a policy for allowing prospective jurors who are older than a certain age to be permanently excused from jury duty. Provides that a circuit court, when determining the age at which a prospective juror may be excused based on age, shall consider the following: the age at which jury duty may become difficult for a significant number of jurors; and the jury pool available for that circuit court. Provides that a prospective juror meeting the age requirement may apply for the exemption based on a self-assessment of his or her physical limitations and mobility issues. Provides that the county board, jury administrator, or jury commissioner shall permanently exclude the prospective juror from all current and subsequent jury lists.
Title
COURTS-JURY DUTY-AGE EXEMPTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2019-03-20 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2019-02-20 | House | To Civil Procedure Subcommittee |
2019-02-20 | House | To Commercial Law Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2203&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2203.htm |