IL HB2193 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-10 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Creates an income tax credit in an amount equal to the amount paid by the taxpayer during the taxable year for the purpose of purchasing acoustical materials, other materials, labor, and professional services to soundproof a residential home located at an eligible address against aircraft noise generated by an airport governed by the provisions of the Permanent Noise Monitoring Act. Provides that the credit may not reduce the taxpayer's liability to less than zero; however, the credit may be carried forward. Provides that the credit is exempt from the Act's automatic sunset provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
INC TX-SOUNDPROOFING
Sponsors
Sen. Diane Pappas [D] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] | Rep. John D'Amico [D] | Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] |
Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Mark Walker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-02-28 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Diane Pappas |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2193&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB2193.htm |