IL HB2165 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0464
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0464
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With regard to required high school courses as a prerequisite to receiving a high school diploma, removes a provision specifying that one year of the required 3 years of mathematics may be an Advanced Placement computer science course. Provides that the required mathematics course that includes geometry content may be offered as an integrated, applied, interdisciplinary, or career and technical education course that prepares a student for a career readiness path.
Title
SCH CD-REQUIRED COURSE-MATH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0464 |
2019-08-26 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-05-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 16, 2019 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Education; 015-000-000 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 12, 2019 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2019-04-11 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy |
2019-04-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-27 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Murphy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 27-22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |