IL HB2157 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Requires that petitions for a municipality to annex contiguous territory that is not within the corporate limits of a municipality must also include: that the petition for annexation is made solely for the benefit of the owners of record of the land and, if applicable, the electors residing in the territory; and that the petition for annexation is not made for the purpose of assisting any municipality in annexing specified unincorporated territory containing 60 acres or less. In provisions concerning annexing unincorporated territory containing 60 acres or less, provides that the land being annexed must be wholly bounded by specified privately owned land. Defines "privately owned land". Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI-ANNEX CONTIGUOUS LAND
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2019-02-19 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 7-1-13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 7-1-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |