IL HB2089 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Passed on July 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-7)
Status: Passed on July 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0192
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Controlled Substances Act. Adds MDPV to the list of Schedule I controlled substances. Effective immediately.
Title
CONTROLLED SUB-MDPV-SCHED-I
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-28 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0192 |
2011-07-22 | House | Effective Date July 22, 2011 |
2011-07-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2011-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2011-05-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2011-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2011-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 112-000-000 |
2011-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2011-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2011-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2 |
2011-05-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2011-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2011-05-28 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2011-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2011-05-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2011-05-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; McCann |
2011-05-28 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2011 |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 006-000-000 |
2011-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Reported Back To Criminal Law; 002-000-000 |
2011-05-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2011-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 To Criminal Law Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 20, 2011 |
2011-05-19 | Senate | Second Reading |
2011-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-12 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2011 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 005-000-000 |
2011-05-11 | Senate | Reported Back To Criminal Law; 003-000-000; Subcommittee on Special Issues |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2011-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2011-04-06 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-03-31 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2011-03-31 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Unes |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Richard Morthland |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Brown |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Roger L. Eddy |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy |
2011-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2011-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-003-000 |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Pam Roth |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Watson |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Reitz |
2011-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-29 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 007-000-000 |
2011-03-17 | House | Remains in Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-03-17 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 003-000-000 |
2011-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Cavaletto |
2011-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2011-03-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Reis |
2011-03-01 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2011-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2011-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2011-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2011-02-24 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-22 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 570 | 204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |